DHIREN HASMUKHLAL VORA
-
About DHIREN HASMUKHLAL VORA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U22122GJ1981PTC004619 VIPUL FORMS AND GRAPHICS PVT LTD 91417210.0 Active 01/06/2014 - U45201GJ1994PTC023913 H NYALCHAND REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 49900000.0 Active 19/12/1994 - U45201GJ2004PTC044845 DEEP INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 26305000.0 Amalgamated 15/12/2004 - U45201GJ2007PTC050185 TERACON PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 89000000.0 Active 01/06/2013 - U45201GJ2007PTC051639 S.G.V. INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 15360000.0 Active 26/06/2014 - U45202GJ2006PTC049459 SAFAL ORGANISERS PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 21/12/2010 - U45202GJ2010PTC059046 SAFAL INFRA-TECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/07/2015 - U45202GJ2010PTC059141 SAFAL PROCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/07/2015 - U45202GJ2010PTC059142 PEACHWOODS INFRA COM PRIVATE LIMITED 41350000.0 Active 15/07/2015 - -
Associated with Directors