DEEPAK KUMAR DAS
-
About DEEPAK KUMAR DAS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L31102OR1982PLC001151 ALFA TRANSFORMERS LIMITED 73950000.0 Active 28/12/1982 - U31300OR1995PTC004243 ORICON INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 5747800.0 Active 03/12/2011 - U70100OR2004PTC011535 PHOENIX SURGICARE PRIVATE LIMITED 1242000.0 Active 02/06/2008 - U74210OR1982PTC001149 INDUSTRIAL DESIGNS AND SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 2756800.0 Active 19/12/1984 - -
Associated with Directors