DIPAK SHROFF
-
About DIPAK SHROFF,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200WB2011PTC158638 SWARN REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 08/04/2011 - U45400WB2007PTC116999 GALANT BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2100000.0 Active 17/05/2011 - U45400WB2008PTC128862 SWARNARATNA INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/08/2008 - U45400WB2011PTC166750 NATURAL AWAS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/01/2014 - U70101WB2004PTC099833 SUNSHINE VALLEY PRIVATE LIMITED 1277000.0 Active 17/09/2004 - U70109WB2011PTC163260 SM CONCLAVE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/06/2011 - U74900WB2012PTC186226 SWARN CORP PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/09/2012 - U74900WB2013PTC190320 ASE CORP PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/02/2013 - -
Associated with Directors