DHIRAJ KUMAR JAISWAL
-
About DHIRAJ KUMAR JAISWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01132AS1999PTC005847 SHREE SAI TEA ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 160000.0 Active 12/08/1999 - U27100AS2012PTC010890 SHREE SANYEEJI ROLLING MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 23/01/2012 - U27106AS2005PLC007889 SHREE SHIV SAI STEEL INDUSTRIES LIMITED 17070000.0 Active 21/09/2005 - U27107AS1991PLC003637 SHREE SANYEEJI ISPAT LIMITED 54055000.0 Active 31/01/1998 - U27107AS1992PLC003736 J P STEELS LTD 25654300.0 Active 03/08/2012 - U27107ML1996PLC008270 SHREE SANYEEJI STEELS LTD 16450000.0 Active 03/08/2012 - U27109AS2000PLC006282 SHREE SAI SPONGE IRON LIMITED 535000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 24/08/2000 - U27109WB2004PLC098866 SHREE SANYEEJI STEEL & POWER LIMITED 378317500.0 Active 16/06/2004 - U51909WB1992PTC056485 SHREE SANYEEJI SPONGE & ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED 44892700.0 Active 11/04/2008 - U70101AS2005PTC007864 ANANNYA REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 1554700.0 Active 31/08/2005 - -
Associated with Directors