DINESH CHANDRA SHAHRA
-
About DINESH CHANDRA SHAHRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L15140MH1986PLC038536 RUCHI SOYA INDUSTRIES LIMITED 688201444.0 Active 07/01/2011 - U15499MH1996PLC100016 RUCHI WORLDWIDE LIMITED 189407000.0 Active 05/06/1996 - U24110MH1996PLC096636 EVERSHINE OLEOCHEM LIMITED 132600000.0 Active 29/01/1996 - U51909MH2003PLC140402 SUNSHINE OLEOCHEM LIMITED 624020000.0 Amalgamated 30/06/2005 - U67190MH2014PTC254659 RSIL HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 60600000.0 Active 19/03/2014 - U70102MH2008PTC182409 DELITE VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/05/2011 - U74140HR2010PTC040510 IFARM VENTURE ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 66000000.0 Active 03/12/2010 - U74140HR2010PTC041774 IFARM EQUITY ADVISORS PRIVATE LIMITED 3000000.0 Active 31/12/2010 - U74999DL2009PTC192620 INDIVAR BEAUTY PRIVATE LIMITED 192002000.0 Active 27/07/2009 - -
Associated with Directors