DEEPAK KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About DEEPAK KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40101WB2002PLC095491 SHYAM METALICS AND ENERGY LIMITED 467220200.0 Active 14/07/2014 - U40102WB2002PLC094303 SHYAM ENERGY LIMITED 1959500.0 Active 12/06/2014 - U45400WB2007PTC115153 IMPROVED REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 1400000.0 Active 28/03/2011 - U45400WB2007PTC117335 EARTHLINK ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 1798250.0 Active 19/07/2007 - U72300WB2012PTC187017 PLUSTECH IT SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/03/2017 - U74140WB2006PTC108056 DRISHTI ADVISORS PVT LTD 2577000.0 Active 17/02/2006 - U74140WB2008PTC129092 SHYAM BUSINESS SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 6418850.0 Active 05/09/2008 - -
Associated with Directors