DAVENDER KUMAR GUPTA
-
About DAVENDER KUMAR GUPTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U25209DL2002PLC117481 HITECH POLY BAG LIMITED 600000.0 Active 01/11/2008 - U45201DL1996PTC080669 TULIP DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/09/1998 - U45201DL2004PTC129384 AERENS TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/09/2004 - U45201DL2004PTC129386 SRIJAN TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/06/2017 - U45201HR1994PTC032396 HARYANA BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 0.0 Active 01/04/1999 - U45202DL1999PLC098854 AERENS BUILDWELL LIMITED 29437000.0 Active 16/03/1999 - U45400DL2007PTC168744 ISHWAR REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/03/2013 - U51505DL1996PTC076292 SAPSHI ELECTRONICS PRIVATE LIMITED 1125450.0 Active 13/09/2016 - U55101DL1996PTC083765 AERENS HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/01/2014 - U70100DL1995PTC070103 TULIP BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/06/1995 - U70101DL2001PTC112125 GOPALPURIA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED. 220000.0 Active 23/08/2001 - U70101DL2005PTC137664 DKG BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/06/2005 - U70101DL2005PTC137693 DKG ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 106000.0 Active 30/09/2014 - U74899DL2001PTC112126 GOPALPURIA ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 110000.0 Active 23/08/2001 - U80904DL2007PTC157936 FMG ACADEMY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/01/2007 -