DILIP DAS
-
About DILIP DAS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L65921WB1993PLC057797 BSR FINANCE & CONSTRUCTIONS LTD 334426500.0 Active 18/04/2006 - U51101WB2010PTC147783 TRUSTLINE SUPPLIERS PRIVATE LIMITED 681400.0 Active 03/03/2017 - U51101WB2010PTC147787 EASTCOAST VINTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 250000.0 Active 04/07/2011 - U51109WB1996PTC081711 LINTON CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 17889250.0 Active 28/08/2001 - U51909WB2008PLC130539 HERITAGE VINTRADE LIMITED 8435000.0 Amalgamated 15/11/2008 - U51909WB2010PTC146351 BALMIKI AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 20370000.0 Active 03/01/2011 - U52190WB2011PTC163708 ASHWINI DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 290900.0 Active 06/09/2011 - U70102WB2013PTC194687 PARAMANTRA INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/06/2013 - U70102WB2013PTC194751 RAMABHAKTA INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/06/2013 - U70102WB2013PTC195365 RAMADUTA INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/07/2013 - U70109WB2017PLC220370 PITCHERS REALTY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/03/2017 -