DAULAT RAM AGARWALA
-
About DAULAT RAM AGARWALA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L24231UP1978PLC004583 ADVANCE STEEL TUBES LIMITED 7400000.0 Active 29/09/1980 - L65929WB1990PLC048280 MARDA COMMERCIAL & HOLDINGS LTD 10000600.0 Active 16/04/2002 - U27101DL1990PLC039747 ADVANCE ISPAT (INDIA) LIMITED 24570000.0 Active 23/04/2010 - U74900DL2007PTC167624 SAUBHAGYA REALTY AND TRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 2400000.0 Converted to LLP 07/06/2016 - -
Associated with Directors