DINESH OSWAL
-
About DINESH OSWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L15143PB1983PLC018321 NAHAR INDUSTRIAL ENTERPRISES LIMITED 398351410.0 Active 15/12/1988 - L17115PB1980PLC004341 NAHAR SPINNING MILLS LTD 180326515.0 Active 21/05/1985 - L17115PB1988PLC008820 NAHAR POLY FILMS LIMITED 122939955.0 Active 11/11/1988 - L45202PB2006PLC029968 NAHAR CAPITAL AND FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED 83730835.0 Active 31/03/2006 - U40300PB1949PLC001522 OSWAL WOOLLEN MILLS LTD 405644700.0 Active 13/07/1992 - U45202PB1994PLC014964 NAHAR INDUSTRIAL INFRASTRUCTURE CORPORATION LIMITED 507000.0 Active 22/08/1994 - U65993DL1972PLC006178 VANAIK INVESTORS LTD 500000.0 Active 06/09/1993 - U67120DL1972PLC006180 ATAM VALLABH FINANCIERS LTD 44500000.0 Active 06/05/1985 - U67120DL1982PTC161884 OGDEN TRADING AND INVESTMENT CO PVT LTD 154980.0 Amalgamated 30/08/1993 - U67120PB1972PLC037121 LUDHIANA HOLDINGS LTD 500000.0 Amalgamated 12/10/1999 - U74899DL1972PLC006181 VARDHMAN INVESTMENTS LTD 53000000.0 Active 09/12/2004 - U74899DL1983PTC015104 KULU INVESTMENT AND TRADING PVT LTD 12074000.0 Amalgamated 30/04/1993 - U74899DL1991PTC043052 ABHILASH GROWTH FUND PRIVATE LIMITED 500200.0 Active 01/10/2005 - -
Associated with Directors