DEEPAK KUMAR TALREJA
-
About DEEPAK KUMAR TALREJA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15122UP2011PTC047905 KANHA WHEAT PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/12/2011 - U15122UP2013PTC059831 R.D. BAKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/09/2013 - U15419UP2001PTC025992 RAMA KRISHNA BAKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 3200600.0 Active 01/04/2009 - U28131UP1998PTC023416 HADKON ELECTRICALS SYSTEM PRIVATE LIMITED 318600.0 Active 01/06/2006 - U45400UP2012PTC049954 MTG INFRA POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 6000000.0 Active 26/12/2013 - U74120UP2013PTC055659 MTG ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/03/2013 - -
Associated with Directors