DIPAK BARMA
-
About DIPAK BARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U29120WB1972PTC028259 HEIZA BOILERS (INDIA) PVT LTD 10000000.0 Active 29/09/1997 - U29305WB1992PTC054350 DYHIR ENGINEERS PVT. LTD. 100000.0 Active 05/02/1992 - U51109WB2006PTC110867 ACROVENT SYSTEMS PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 28/07/2006 - U85300WB1909GAP001941 TOLLYGUNGE CLUB LTD. 0.0 Active 05/08/2016 - -
Associated with Directors