DEEPAK SHARMA
-
About DEEPAK SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15142RJ1991PLC006268 SARVODAYA AGROTECH INDIA LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 27/04/2016 - U40104RJ2000PLC016253 CHETAK ENTERPRISES LIMITED 165000000.0 Active 14/04/2016 - U45201RJ2011PLC037354 CHETAK MITRA TOLLWAYS LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 13/04/2016 - U45203MP1988PTC004500 SERMAN INDIA ROAD MAKERS PVT LTD 17500000.0 Active 07/04/1988 - U45203RJ2011PLC036595 CHETAK JAINCO TOLLWAYS LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 13/04/2016 - U45203RJ2012PLC039006 CHETAK TOLLWAYS LIMITED 1100000000.0 Active 13/04/2016 - U45203RJ2013PLC041595 NASHIK SINNAR TOLLWAYS LIMITED 725000000.0 Active 13/04/2016 - -
Associated with Directors