DEVINDER SANDHU
-
About DEVINDER SANDHU,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01403PB2012PTC036887 WWICS ACREAGES AND FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/11/2012 - U01403PB2012PTC036888 WWICS AGROFARMS AND ORCHARDS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/11/2012 - U01403PB2012PTC036894 WWICS FARMS AND ORCHARDS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/12/2012 - U45201CH1998PTC021515 PINNACLE INFO EDGE PRIVATE LIMITED 43943550.0 Active 19/06/1998 - U55101DL2003PTC119146 WWICS RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 226414470.0 Active 25/02/2003 - U70101PB2001PTC037345 WWICS ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 05/07/2001 - U70109CH2011PTC032973 EUPHORIA HIGHLANDS RESORTS & FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/08/2011 - U70109CH2011PTC032974 LA SOLACE RESORTS & FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/05/2011 - U70109CH2011PTC032975 STARGAZE COUNTRY RESORTS & FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/05/2011 - U70109CH2011PTC033215 SHANGRI-LA RESORTS & VILLAS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/09/2011 - U70109CH2011PTC033216 SPRINGDALE RESORTS & VILLAS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/09/2011 - U70109CH2011PTC033224 SYMPHONY BREEZE RESORTS & FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/09/2011 - U70109CH2011PTC033225 UTOPIAN HEIGHTS RESORTS & FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/09/2011 - U70109CH2011PTC033226 LA FINNESE RESORTS & FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/09/2011 - U70109CH2011PTC033227 MOONLIGHT MEADOWS RESORTS & FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/09/2011 - U70109CH2011PTC033246 SERENE GREENS RESORTS & VILLAS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/09/2011 - U72200PB2001PTC024549 WWICS SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 250000.0 Active 15/09/2008 - U74140DL2002PTC117853 WWICS GLOBAL LAW OFFICES PRIVATE LIMITED 379840910.0 Active 02/12/2002 - U80302DL2003PTC119464 CIIS EDUCATIONAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/03/2003 - U80903CH1997PLC020726 WWICS EDUCATIONAL SERVICES LIMITED 2252000.0 Active 31/01/1998 - -
Associated with Directors