DEEPENDRA SHANKER AGARWAL
-
About DEEPENDRA SHANKER AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200UP2007PTC032744 SHREE RADHEY HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2009 - U45201UP2003PTC027544 CHANDRA COLONISERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/05/2003 - U45400UP2007PTC033101 SHREE GOVERDHAN AWAS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2009 - U45400UP2008PTC035403 RAGHUNATH INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/06/2008 - U45400UP2008PTC036150 ADITYA ASHIYANA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/10/2008 - U50102UP2011PTC045238 MADHUSUDAN VEHICLES PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 13/06/2011 - U70102UP2010PTC040300 SHYAMJI DWELLINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/04/2010 - U70102UP2010PTC041391 BIHARIJI DWELLINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/07/2010 - U70102UP2011PTC046384 PINAKI BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/08/2011 - U70102UP2012PTC049191 DURJAYA BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/03/2014 - U70200UP2012PTC048346 JAIPAL BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/01/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
VASUDHA AGARWAL Director RACHIT AGARWAL Director KRISHAN MOHAN GUPTA Director USHA AGARWAL Director