DILIP KUMAR GOENKA
-
About DILIP KUMAR GOENKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U23101ML2005PLC007832 MEGHALAYA FUELS LIMITED 1090000.0 Active 28/07/2005 - U40101AS2008PLC008826 KD POWER LIMITED 9025000.0 Active 01/10/2008 - U45209AS2010PTC010211 KCL CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 6950000.0 Active 27/09/2010 - U70101AS1997PTC005091 S D S PROPERTIES PVT LTD 31284000.0 Active 04/02/2011 -