DILIP OOMMEN
-
About DILIP OOMMEN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27100GJ1976FLC013787 ESSAR STEEL INDIA LIMITED 31525566110.0 Active 17/12/2011 - U27100GJ2005FLC045786 HAZIRA PLATE LIMITED 8004672340.0 Amalgamated 25/09/2008 - U27100GJ2005FLC046273 ESSAR STEEL (HAZIRA) LIMITED 30568591300.0 Amalgamated 22/12/2008 - U27310GJ2015FLC082653 ESSAR METALLICS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 23/03/2015 - U40100DL2005PLC201961 ESSAR POWER M P LIMITED 26883530550.0 Active 20/09/2010 - U40300GJ2006PLC063146 ESSAR POWER HAZIRA LIMITED 5800000000.0 Active 17/08/2010 - U74900GJ2007PLC066273 ESSAR POWER GUJARAT LIMITED 26085563050.0 Active 04/09/2009 - -
Associated with Directors