DEEPAK GARG
-
About DEEPAK GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200DL2008PTC172576 BANKE BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/09/2011 - U45200DL2008PTC179580 EKANSH BUILDTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 15/12/2014 - U45200DL2008PTC179583 ABHAS REALCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/07/2011 - U45201DL2004PTC130453 PRIMORDIAL BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 15/12/2014 - U45201DL2005PTC135289 KISHORDEEP REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/12/2011 - U45201DL2005PTC135316 JAIDEV COLONISERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/12/2011 - U45201DL2005PTC141513 NEW HORIZONS TOWNSHIP DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/12/2011 - U45201DL2005PTC141542 SHANTINIWAS DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/12/2011 - U45201RJ2008PTC026351 SARVA BUILDTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/07/2011 - U45202PB2006PTC030174 ADVAITA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/12/2011 - U45202PB2006PTC030176 AGASTHYA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/12/2011 - U45400UP2007PTC033200 AVIRAL COLONIZERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/07/2011 - U45400UP2008PTC035736 SATKAR COLONISERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/07/2011 - U65192HR1996PLC048717 CONSTELLATION CAPITAL LIMITED 36607500.0 Amalgamated 29/07/2011 - U70100PB2006PTC030170 AMOD BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/12/2011 - U70101DL2005PTC134870 DEVGAR ESTATE DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/12/2011 - U70102DL2007PTC167078 NAVADIP DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/07/2011 - U70102DL2008PTC179571 ANVESHAN BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/07/2011 - U74120HR2007PTC036993 ROBUST BUILDWELL PRIVATE LIMITED 380000000.0 Active 13/09/2011 - U74899DL2005PLC143665 OMAXE HOTELS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 06/07/2011 - U74899HR1995PLC048716 S A FINVEST LIMITED 41609900.0 Amalgamated 29/07/2011 - U74999UP2008PTC035646 UTKRISHT REAL ESTATE & ASSOCIATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/07/2011 - -
Associated with Directors