DINESH SHARMA
-
About DINESH SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB2012PTC177055 FUNIDEA CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 130000.0 Active 20/08/2012 - U51101WB2012PTC178134 SHIVASTHAN VINCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 121000.0 Active 25/08/2012 - U51103WB2012PTC177681 SHIVPUJAN TRACOM PRIVATE LIMITED 140000.0 Active 18/08/2012 - U51909WB2011PTC163460 IDEA MERCHANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 8830650.0 Active 08/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC177165 KAMALDHAN COMMODEAL PRIVATE LIMITED 140000.0 Active 16/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC177190 RANDATA SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 130000.0 Active 21/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC177247 MANGALDHAM DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 140000.0 Active 10/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC177261 SANKATSATHI VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 121000.0 Active 21/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC177265 RAKSHAMATA COMMERCE PRIVATE LIMITED 130000.0 Active 13/08/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC177281 SHIVRATRI IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 140000.0 Active 23/08/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
KANI LAL SHARMA Director PIYOOSH PODDAR Director SUSHIL SHARMA Director