DEEPAK SHYAMSINGH LULLA
-
About DEEPAK SHYAMSINGH LULLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U07010KA2000PTC026616 A.V. SHELTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 19999000.0 Active 08/03/2004 - U45201KA2005PTC038068 SAMHRUTHA HABITAT INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 143403780.0 Active 16/09/2013 - U55101KA2006PTC039224 TWENTY FOUR SEVEN HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED 29908100.0 Active 03/05/2006 - U65999KA1999PTC024759 JUBILEE INSURANCE BROKING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 8106050.0 Active 07/02/2005 - U70100MH2005PTC155333 GOLDCHIP PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 5200000.0 Active 17/05/2014 - U74999AP2000PLC033815 GLOBAL MULTIPLEX LIMITED 28485800.0 Active 30/07/2013 - U85110KA1989PTC009758 HABITAT SHELTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 12678900.0 Active 16/01/1989 - -
Associated with Directors