DEREK MICHAEL SHAH
-
About DEREK MICHAEL SHAH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U29119MH2006PTC165102 L&T- MHPS BOILERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2341000000.0 Active 17/05/2016 - U31101MH2006PTC166541 L&T - MHPS TURBINE GENERATORS PRIVATE LIMITED 7106000000.0 Active 17/05/2016 - U31401MH2010PTC204403 L&T HOWDEN PRIVATE LIMITED 300000000.0 Active 03/05/2016 - U40100MH2006PLC160413 L&T POWER LIMITED 511640.0 Active 05/05/2016 - U74210MH1995PLC088099 L&T-SARGENT & LUNDY LIMITED 55654630.0 Active 20/04/2016 - -
Associated with Directors