DEEPAK KUMAR KHEMKA
-
About DEEPAK KUMAR KHEMKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U17232WB1920PLC003640 JAI JUTE AND INDUSTRIES LIMITED 77998400.0 Active 08/09/2014 - U51109WB1983PLC036253 SHIKHA INDIA LTD 2402000.0 Active 25/07/2016 - U51109WB2008PTC125164 SAMRIDDHI VANIJYA PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 28/03/2016 - U51226WB1991PTC051397 BAHUBALI TRADERS PVT. LTD. 15686300.0 Active 11/12/2014 - U51909WB1997PTC084579 SANATAN COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 3000.0 Active 30/11/2002 - -
Associated with Directors
PAWAN SIKARIA Director BIRENDRA KUMAR MISHRA Director SUCHI SIKARIA Director