DILIP DAS
-
About DILIP DAS,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400WB1985PLC038610 AEREX DBR (I) LTD. 500000.0 Amalgamated 29/01/2015 - U45400WB2007PTC120818 ROLEX NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 2078240.0 Amalgamated 20/03/2015 - U51101WB2010PTC151178 ORIGIN VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 2034990.0 Active 22/12/2015 - U70102WB2015PLC205620 DH MAINTENANCE LIMITED 517272.0 Active 16/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
RAMESH KUMAR AGRAWAL Director TANISHA CHOUDHURY Director ANIL KUMAR LAHOTY Director BRATIN BOSE Director