DEVARSHI VISHAL MEHTA
-
About DEVARSHI VISHAL MEHTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40100GJ2017PTC097319 SYMARRON TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 16/05/2017 - U40106GJ2017PTC097195 TRIDEV RENEWABLE ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 02/05/2017 - U40106GJ2017PTC097298 DEVRUT WIND ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 15/05/2017 - U40106GJ2017PTC097300 MEBH WIND ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 15/05/2017 - U40106GJ2017PTC097307 VD RENEWABLE ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 15/05/2017 - U40106GJ2017PTC097331 TRIDEV WIND ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 16/05/2017 - U40106GJ2017PTC097349 DEVRUT RENEWABLE ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 17/05/2017 - U40106GJ2017PTC097472 BHATT WIND ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 22/05/2017 - U40108GJ2017PTC097304 DVM RENEWABLE ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 15/05/2017 - U40300GJ2017PTC097180 MEBH RENEWABLE ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 02/05/2017 - U40300GJ2017PTC097197 VGB WIND ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 02/05/2017 - U40300GJ2017PTC097217 VD WIND ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 03/05/2017 - U40300GJ2017PTC097219 VGB RENEWABLE ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 03/05/2017 - U40300GJ2017PTC097305 DVM WIND ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 15/05/2017 - U40300GJ2017PTC097348 BHATT RENEWABLE ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 200.0 Active 17/05/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
NIDHI TULSIBHAI TANTI Director VISHRUT GAURANGKUMAR BHATT Director BRIJ JITENDRA TANTI Director