DEEPA BHAVSAR RUPESH
-
About DEEPA BHAVSAR RUPESH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L17110MH2004PTC030725 SATYAM SILK MILLS LIMITED 7350000.0 Active 26/05/2015 - L51900MH1981PLC025265 RIDHI SYNTHETICS LIMITED 4900000.0 Active 29/05/2015 - L51900MH1985PLC036383 DEVINSU TRADING LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 27/05/2015 - L67120MH1986PLC039919 PUNCTUAL TRADING LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 28/05/2015 -