DEEPAK KUMAR GUPTA
-
About DEEPAK KUMAR GUPTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U65993TG2011PLC077813 KARVY HOLDINGS LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 18/02/2016 - U74999TG2016PLC110435 URJASVALA SOLAR POWER LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/03/2017 - U74999TG2016PLC110571 SUVARCHAS SOLAR POWER LIMITED 122549000.0 Active 05/12/2016 - U74999TG2016PLC110573 VISHVARUPA SOLAR POWER LIMITED 122549000.0 Active 05/12/2016 - U74999TG2016PLC110676 KARVY RENEWABLE ENERGY PROJECTS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 04/07/2016 - U99999TG1995PTC019294 LOTUS SHIELDERS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 64737500.0 Active 06/02/2016 - -
Associated with Directors