FRANCIS ANTONY
-
About FRANCIS ANTONY,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01409WB2004PTC097979 SYNERGY AGRI PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED 22417500.0 Active 02/05/2006 - U40300WB2010PTC150517 SPS SYNERGY SOLAR PRIVATE LIMITED 600000.0 Active 17/06/2010 - U72200WB1999PTC088599 SYNERGY TECHNICAL SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 612000.0 Active 22/02/2011 - U72200WB1999PTC090366 SYNERGY ELECTRIC PRIVATE LIMITED 409946800.0 Active 21/09/2017 - U74140WB2002PTC095214 SYNERGY GROUP HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 1250000.0 Active 11/03/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
CECIL ANTONY Director