GAGAN DINANATH CHATURVEDI
-
About GAGAN DINANATH CHATURVEDI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01400MH2009PTC197904 MAYOS GO GREEN PRIVATE LIMITED 6100000.0 Active 31/08/2011 - U01400MH2011PTC222407 CHATURVEDI AGRICULTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/05/2017 - U01403MH2011PTC222352 A TO Z PLANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 4100000.0 Active 28/03/2014 - U51900MH1993PTC073121 HARINIM TRADE & TRAVELS PRIVATE LIMITED 1625000.0 Active 26/12/1994 - U65923MH2014PTC253948 AGELESS CAPITAL AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 103500000.0 Active 07/03/2014 - U65990MH1990PTC056666 CHATURVEDI & SHAH CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 01/09/2006 - U65990MH1990PTC056667 KAMVAN CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 49900000.0 Active 15/05/2017 - U67120MH1993PTC260638 A TO Z BROKING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 45000000.0 Converted to LLP 13/01/2000 - U70100MH2011PTC215692 PRADEEP SANDEEP REALTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 03/04/2011 - U70102MH2011PTC213786 ANGULARITY REALTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 15/05/2017 - -
Associated with Directors