GURPREET KAUR SHINH
-
About GURPREET KAUR SHINH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200TG2007PLC055976 MOUNTAIN DEW PROPERTIES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 17/10/2007 - U52100TG2010PTC069035 STRAWBERRY TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 21/06/2010 - U52300TG2010PTC068892 ADAMAS TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/06/2010 - U52520TG2004PTC044307 HERITAGE TEXTURE SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/08/2006 - U74999TG2007PTC053943 BAKELITE COATINGS & PAINTS PRIVATE LIMITED 7000000.0 Active 15/05/2007 - U74999TG2008PTC057357 BAKELITE PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/09/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
JAIDEEP SINGH SHINH Director NARINDER PAL SINGH Director LEMANTH SAI MANDAVA Director