GYAN CHAND AGARWAL
-
About GYAN CHAND AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U25201RJ1995PTC010349 SHREE SALASAR OVERSEAS PVT LTD 8727150.0 Active 10/09/2003 - U45201RJ2006PTC022469 HANUMAN KRIPA REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/05/2007 - U45201RJ2006PTC022532 VISHNUKRIPA LAND DEVELOPERS AND CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2008 15/12/2014 U45201RJ2006PTC023431 EMERALD BUILDHOME PRIVATE LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 25/02/2007 - -
Associated with Directors