GURBACHAN SINGH DHINGRA
-
About GURBACHAN SINGH DHINGRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L51434WB1923PLC004793 BERGER PAINTS INDIA LIMITED 971031428.0 Active 14/05/1993 - U45400DL2008PTC178130 BURGEON PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/05/2008 - U55101DL2009PTC188903 VALERIAN HOSPITALITY AND HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/03/2009 - U65993DL1988PLC033155 CITLAND COMMERCIAL CREDITS LIMITED 38347900.0 Active 19/02/1991 - U70101DL1996PTC075937 VG PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 23969110.0 Active 08/05/2013 - U70109DL2007PTC158529 ARAMBOL PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/01/2007 - U70200DL2009PTC190961 RISHKUL PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/06/2009 - U74140DL2007PLC167131 SEAWARD PACKAGING LIMITED 10000080.0 Active 12/08/2009 - U74899DL1981PTC012828 FLEX PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 09/05/1995 - U74899DL1988PTC030250 VIGNETTE INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 27450020.0 Amalgamated 04/03/1991 - U74899DL1991PTC044957 BIGG INVESTMENTS AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 7963200.0 Active 14/10/1991 - U74899DL1992PTC048517 MALIBU ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 27283600.0 Active 22/10/1992 - U74899DL1994PTC057199 JOLLY PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2477200.0 Active 10/02/2007 - U74899DL1994PTC057313 WANG INVESTMENT & FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 148564360.0 Active 28/07/2017 - U74899DL1995PTC072853 SCORPIO RESEARCH AND CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 900200.0 Converted to LLP 18/11/1999 - U74899DL1996PTC082343 BERGER BECKER COATINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 55293900.0 Active 30/09/1996 - U80100DL2008PTC183323 MALIBU SHINING STAR PRIMARY SCHOOL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 26/03/2015 - U80900DL2008PTC183332 MALIBU KIDSCARE NURSERY SCHOOL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/03/2015 - U80900DL2008PTC183336 MALIBU HIGHER SECONDARY SCHOOL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 26/03/2015 - U85310DL2008PTC183313 MALIBU CRECHE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors