GIRISH MALLPANI
-
About GIRISH MALLPANI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200TG1987PTC007864 MAHESHWARI INFRASTRUCTURE & SKYSCRAPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1591600.0 Active 01/04/1999 - U45200TG2014PTC093692 MPM MALL AND ARCADES PRIVATE LIMITED 4576990.0 Active 21/03/2014 - U45209TG2008PTC059927 GENTEN INFRA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/06/2008 - U45400TG2007PTC054705 GLOBECOM INFRA VENTURES INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/05/2008 - U45400TG2008PTC059990 KSHITIJ INFRA VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 167240960.0 Active 04/07/2008 - U45400TG2008PTC060036 TANISHQ INFRA VENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 41885240.0 Active 15/05/2016 - U55101TG1999PTC032502 AMBIENCE RESORTS AND MOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 12250000.0 Active 05/06/2010 - U70102TG2006PTC049511 GMS REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/04/2008 -