GIRDHARILAL SHAMLAL VAID
-
About GIRDHARILAL SHAMLAL VAID,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MH1982PTC028371 ASHISH HOUSING AND CONSTRUCTION PVT LTD 10100000.0 Active 04/10/1982 - U45202MH1982PTC027927 SPAN CONSTRUCTION CO PVT LTD 100000.0 Amalgamated 18/07/2000 - U52320MH1991PTC062194 ASHISH EXIM PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 24/06/1991 - U70100MH1981PTC025550 ASHISH ESTATES AND PROPERTIES PVT LTD 1000000.0 Active 04/11/1981 - U70102MH1985PTC036546 SHUCHI DEVELOPERS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 10/06/1985 - U70102MH2010PTC209759 A G SUPERSTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 02/11/2010 - U70200MH1989PTC053556 ASHISH REAL ESTATES PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 20/09/1989 - U99999MH1991PTC062198 ASHISH REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 30100000.0 Active 24/06/1991 - -
Associated with Directors
ASHISH GIRDHARILAL VAID Director KRISHNA MURARI GOENKA Director SUNITA GOENKA Director