GYAN CHAND DAGA
-
About GYAN CHAND DAGA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L45200MH1993PLC071970 ASHOKA BUILDCON LIMITED 935744055.0 Active 18/02/2013 - U28113MH1996PLC096835 VIRAJ PROFILES LIMITED 1273161086.0 Active 31/03/2016 - U45200MH2001PLC171661 VIVA HIGHWAYS LIMITED 98082050.0 Active 28/04/2014 - U45201MH2011PLC215760 ASHOKA CONCESSIONS LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 30/04/2014 - -
Associated with Directors