GOBIND RAM GOENKA
-
About GOBIND RAM GOENKA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L01132WB1918PLC003029 NAGA DHUNSERI GROUP LTD. 10000000.0 Active 28/01/2009 - L27106WB1959PLC024177 HINDUSTAN WIRES LTD 145000000.0 Active 31/10/2002 - U33300MH1937PTC002640 LUND AND BLOCKLEY PVT LTD 304500.0 Active 01/09/2007 - U36911WB1922PTC004431 J BOSECK & CO PVT LTD 1391800.0 Active 31/08/2007 - U51109WB1995PTC068498 SUPREET VYAPAAR PVT LTD 12676000.0 Active 15/06/2004 - U51909WB1980PTC033027 AJAY COMMERCIAL CO PVT LTD 11985000.0 Active 18/05/1992 - U51909WB1980PTC033099 J B COMMERCIAL CO PVT LTD 3066000.0 Active 03/10/1988 - U51909WB1995PTC071770 FACIT COMMOSALES PVT LTD 31650000.0 Active 15/01/2013 - U51909WB1996PTC080344 MAYUR BARTER PVT LTD 64189500.0 Active 25/12/2004 - U65993WB1989PTC047330 SEAROCK CREDIT PVT LTD 20477000.0 Active 01/08/1989 - U67120WB1957PTC023508 GENERAL ENTERPRISES PVT LTD 110000.0 Active 01/12/1964 - U74900WB2013PTC190176 MANGALSUDHA IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/01/2013 - U74999WB1994PTC064103 G. P. DEALERS PVT. LTD. 2000000.0 Active 25/07/1994 - -
Associated with Directors