GAJENDER GARG
-
About GAJENDER GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51109DL2008PTC174524 ANITA SAKSHI MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 4062500.0 Active 25/07/2009 - U51909DL2004PLC130891 MSR MARKETING LIMITED 7991570.0 Active 30/04/2012 - U70109DL2006PTC152465 NKR INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 2910130.0 Active 19/12/2014 - U70109DL2006PTC152756 JAGRITI TRADECON PRIVATE LIMITED 1198000.0 Amalgamated 24/03/2012 - -
Associated with Directors
RAMESH GOEL Director DINESH KUMAR Director KAPIL AGRWAL Director NEERAJ KUMAR Director