GAURI SHANKAR MARDA
-
About GAURI SHANKAR MARDA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27109TG1988PTC008762 PREMIER ALLOYS AND CHEMICALS PVT LTD 19500000.0 Active 15/06/1988 - U40101TG2014PTC094154 FREYR ENERGY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 32180290.0 Active 01/06/2014 - U40300TG2017PTC121227 FREYR PPA SPV ONE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/12/2017 - U41000TG1987PLC007137 JEEDIMETLA EFFLUENT TREATMENT LIMITED. 21000000.0 Active 14/08/2006 - U45200TG2005NPL045814 HYDERABAD PHARMA INFRASTRUCTURE AND TECHNOLOGIES 500000.0 Active 17/10/2005 - -
Associated with Directors