GOPALJEE RAGAVAN
-
About GOPALJEE RAGAVAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24299PY1998PTC001414 RAGIV INKS PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Active 30/06/1998 - U40101TN2007PTC063365 MALAR ENERGY & INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 82500000.0 Active 04/05/2007 - U50103TN2005PTC057788 SRI SHEETHALA BALAJI MOTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 01/03/2006 - U52321TN1992PTC022398 GEE EXPO TRADES PRIVATE LIMITED 2100000.0 Active 25/03/1992 - U52599TN1997PTC038026 FAITH TRADE SERVICE PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 22/04/1997 - U70102TN2009PTC074097 MALAR PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/12/2009 - U92132TN2000PTC046249 MALAR NETWORK PRIVATE LIMITED 575000.0 Active 06/12/2000 - U92132TN2004PTC053399 MALAR CABLE VISIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 03/06/2004 - -
Associated with Directors