GOVIND AGRAWAL
-
About GOVIND AGRAWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U18101MH2000PTC126559 DEV TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/06/2017 - U45200MH1990PTC055459 SANJIVANI DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 503000.0 Active 01/06/2017 - U45200MH2003PTC142991 SAMVED REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/06/2017 - U45400MH2009PTC198152 AADIPTA INFRA-PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 10/10/2013 30/03/2017 U51900MH2006PTC158674 RADHAKRISHNA SELLING AND MAREKTING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/01/2006 - U52322MH2005PTC158228 SAB TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 885000.0 Active 21/12/2005 - U70101MH2004PTC143849 FASTGROWTH PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2100000.0 Active 01/06/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
RAJAN DNYANDEO KHANOLKAR Director PRAVEEN KRISHNA NAYAK Director BEENA AGRAWAL Director