GURKIR PAUL SINGH BHALLA
-
About GURKIR PAUL SINGH BHALLA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U50300DL1991PLC046107 INTERNATIONAL MERITIME INSTITUTE LIMITED 7112790.0 Active 01/09/1999 - U51909DL2004PTC127467 ECOTEC ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 105000.0 Active 08/07/2004 - U80211UR2003NPL028123 INTERNATIONAL MARITIME INSTITUTE 706600.0 Active 10/12/2003 - U93000DL2009PTC196952 MITHRA HOLDING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/01/2010 - U93000DL2009PTC196953 ANKH HOLDING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/01/2010 - U93020DL2009PTC196951 LOGOS HOLDING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 750100000.0 Active 20/01/2010 -