GOENKA ROBIN RAMAVTAR
-
About GOENKA ROBIN RAMAVTAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200GJ2006PTC048877 PUNYA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/10/2007 - U45200GJ2011PTC066307 UNICORP INFRABUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/07/2011 - U45201GJ2007PTC052229 HET INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/11/2007 - U45201GJ2007PTC052407 GINGER PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 20/12/2007 - U45201GJ2008PTC053530 RK INFRA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 09/04/2008 - U45201GJ2008PTC054733 SANKALP ORGANISERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/08/2008 - U45206GJ2009PTC057343 RICHGOLD PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/06/2009 - U55101GJ2009PTC057344 SANKALP RESIDENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/06/2009 - U55101GJ2014PTC078531 ODELEYS HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/01/2014 - U67190MH2011PTC212469 ASHWAMEGH LOGICAL FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 29/12/2012 - U70101GJ2015PTC082111 BACK FORTY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/02/2015 -