GAJINDER SINGH SAHNI
-
About GAJINDER SINGH SAHNI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L27100MH1973PLC016617 SARDA ENERGY & MINERALS LIMITED 360492350.0 Active 04/03/2008 - U11200DL2010PTC209353 MDL ENERGY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 23/06/2011 - U29219DL2006PTC156146 VIK-SANDVIK DESIGN INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 21/07/2011 - U45203DL2000PTC108494 MDL ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 18065610.0 Active 01/08/2010 - U45207DL2007PTC160258 MDL ENGINEERING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/09/2014 - U61100MH1975NPL018244 INDIAN REGISTER OF SHIPPING 0.0 Active 14/07/2017 - U74899DL1994PLC061349 MADHYA BHARAT POWER CORPORATION LIMITED 1623240400.0 Active 30/09/2014 - U93000DL2017PTC323129 HERAANAS ATTIC INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/09/2017 - -
Associated with Directors