GAURAV BAJAJ
-
About GAURAV BAJAJ,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U50100WB2016PTC210075 MOHAN MOTOR INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/03/2016 - U50100WB2017PTC223804 MOHAN MOTOR CAR PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/12/2017 - U50102WB2009PTC134548 MOHAN MOTOR DISTRIBUTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 8472770.0 Active 10/06/2010 - U50102WB2014PTC200158 MOHAN MOTOR TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 25100000.0 Active 10/01/2018 - U50102WB2015PTC205343 MOHAN MOTOR SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 19/02/2015 - U50103WB2011PTC167589 MOHAN MOTOR SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 2600000.0 Active 16/12/2013 - U50103WB2016PTC210099 MOHAN MOTOR SUPER BIKES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2016 - U50300WB2017PTC223882 MOHAN MOTOR CITY WHEELS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/12/2017 - U51109WB2006PTC108247 PROGRESSIVE VANIJYA PRIVATE LIMITED 592800.0 Active 10/09/2011 - U51109WB2006PTC110086 MARUTI VANIJYA PRIVATE LIMITED 950000.0 Active 20/04/2017 - U51109WB2007PTC116081 SUNGLOW VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 05/11/2011 - U51909WB2007PTC115457 APOLLO VYAPAAR PRIVATE LIMITED 950000.0 Active 19/12/2011 - U70101WB1999PTC090145 SUYOG NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 10280200.0 Active 20/04/2017 - U74140WB2005PTC103722 MOHAN INSURANCE & FINANCIAL CONSULTANCY PRIVATE LIMITED 439700.0 Active 01/10/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
PRITI BAJAJ Director SANDIP KUMAR BAJAJ Director PRADIP KUMAR LOHARIWALA Director SUJIT PAUL Director