GAURANG GARG
-
About GAURANG GARG,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U02001UP1996PTC021197 SANSAR AGRICULTURE AND CONSTRUCTIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 104000.0 Active 03/08/2016 - U27310UP1989PTC011429 SPBL ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 3000000.0 Active 01/10/2011 - U65910UP1996PTC021196 KISHORE BROTHERS SECURITIES AND INVESTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 429000.0 Active 04/08/2016 - U65993UP1995PTC017699 RADHEY STOCK AND SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED 1455000.0 Active 05/08/2016 - U67120UP1942PTC001119 U P SHARE SYNDICATE PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 05/08/2016 - U74120UP2013PTC055659 MTG ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 02/06/2014 -