GOURI SHANKAR YADAV
-
About GOURI SHANKAR YADAV,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909WB2010PTC144355 SILVERSON COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/06/2014 - U51909WB2011PTC157050 JASPER DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/06/2014 - U51909WB2011PTC157055 SARGAM COMMOTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/09/2015 - U51909WB2011PTC157057 STARMARK AGENCIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/06/2014 - U51909WB2011PTC157058 SUBHDATA SUPPLIERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/06/2014 - U51909WB2016PTC209965 RASHDHARA COMMODEAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/05/2016 - U52100WB2016PTC210197 PUSHPA KAMAL STOCKISTS & TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/05/2016 - U74140WB2011PTC159110 ONTIME ENCLAVE ADVISORY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/02/2017 - U74140WB2011PTC159114 SAFELINE REALBUILD CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/02/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
DINESH UPADHYAY Director RAVI SINGHAL Director AJIT KUMAR SHARMA Director DEO KUMAR SHAW Director