HARISH CHANDER SHARMA
-
About HARISH CHANDER SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40101DL1999PTC099002 RIGOSS ELECTRIC DISTRIBUTION COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/07/2003 - U45201DL1997PTC091336 MADAKINEE ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/12/2008 - U45201DL1999PTC098223 RIGOSS ESTATE NETWORKS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/07/2003 - U51103DL1992PTC047642 BEDI EXPORTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/05/2010 - U70101DL1998PTC096126 A P M BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/12/2008 - U70109DL1997PTC091337 CHANDRAPRABHA ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/12/2008 - U70109DL1998PTC095629 TRIVENI APARTMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/08/2007 - U74899DL1991PTC043559 MIDAIR PROPERTIES PVT. LTD. 100000.0 Active 26/12/2008 - U74899DL1992PTC050178 AADHARSHILA TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 3060000.0 Active 05/05/2010 - U74899DL1994PTC060144 M K TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/05/2010 - U74899DL1994PTC060157 S S TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/05/2010 - U74899DL1994PTC060163 K C TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/05/2010 - U74899DL1994PTC060174 K J TOWERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/05/2010 - U74899DL1994PTC060262 S J TOWERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/05/2010 -