HARIVALLABH PARMANANDDAS MUNDHRA
-
About HARIVALLABH PARMANANDDAS MUNDHRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U26900MH1956PLC009830 EVINCO EXIM LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 18/06/2015 - U31100MH1994PTC076066 SHREE NURSINGSAHAY MUDUNGOPAL (BOMBAY) ELECTRIC CO.PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/01/1994 - U31500MH1985PTC037434 CLASSIC LUMINAIRES PVT LTD 506660.0 Active 09/09/1985 - U31900MH1988PTC046123 CREATIVE LIGHTS PRIVATE LIMITED 300020.0 Active 05/02/1988 - U51909WB1920PLC003891 THE EAST INDIA ELECTRIC SUPPLY & TRACTION CO LTD 560710.0 Active 30/09/1994 - U64200MH2005PTC150878 NM TELE SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/01/2005 - U65990MH1988PTC049638 NANDAN HOLDINGS PVT LTD 107210.0 Active 16/11/1988 - U70101MH1989PTC051658 BAHAR BUILDING ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 101000.0 Active 09/05/1989 - U70102MH2005PTC150650 DESINE PROPERTIES AND CONSULTANCY PRIVATE LIMITED 27306000.0 Active 14/01/2005 - U74900MH2010PTC205796 BHAVADEEP ELECTRICALS & SWITCHGEARS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 21/07/2010 - U74950HR1973PTC006460 ASHOKA PACKERS PVT LTD 500000.0 Active 13/08/2009 - -
Associated with Directors