HUKAM CHAND DAGA
-
About HUKAM CHAND DAGA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L17119WB1935PLC046111 THE RAMESHWARA JUTE MILLS LTD 2661000.0 Active 29/09/2005 - U10200WB2007PTC120295 SL PGM MINING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 3800000.0 Active 07/11/2007 - U13209WB2007PTC120292 SL BASE METAL MINING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 3400000.0 Active 07/11/2007 - U13209WB2007PTC120293 AB METAL MINING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 3320000.0 Active 07/11/2007 - U13209WB2007PTC120294 AB BASE METAL MINING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 07/11/2007 - U13209WB2007PTC120296 AB PGM MINING COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 07/11/2007 - U45203OR2010PLC012703 ADITYA BIRLA PORTS LIMITED 5250000.0 Active 19/11/2010 - U67120WB1998PTC086520 SUNGOD COAL MINING CO. PRIVATE LIMITED 1860000.0 Active 10/02/1998 - -
Associated with Directors