HARISH CHANDRA JAYESH AGARWAL
-
About HARISH CHANDRA JAYESH AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U13209TG2007PTC069060 PRAKASH FERROUS INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 56568430.0 Active 26/12/2007 - U27105TN1999PTC042208 METAL & SCRAP TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 9557000.0 Active 05/04/1999 - U27106TN2004PTC053555 MEENAKSHI UDYOG (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 15910000.0 Active 24/06/2004 - U74899DL1990PTC040204 SHAKUN FINMAN CONSULTANTS PVT LTD 3070000.0 Active 20/08/2009 - U74899DL1991PTC043888 ADDWINGS SECMAN RESOURCES PRIVATE LIMITED 5782500.0 Active 20/08/2009 -