HARMINDER SINGH
-
About HARMINDER SINGH,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200DL2006PTC155333 SDL REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/10/2011 - U52322DL2010PTC203184 N K RETAILS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 26/05/2010 - U70102DL2013PTC252266 KONCORDE CONTRACTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/11/2015 - U70200DL2009PTC189443 SM TOWNSHIPS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/04/2009 - U74899DL1980PTC010264 AJANTA BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 104000.0 Active 20/09/1997 - U74899DL1988PTC033837 TAPTI FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 2850000.0 Active 27/02/2010 - U74899DL1993PTC052555 REAL STAR BUILDERS AND EXPORTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 102700.0 Active 02/11/2009 - U74999DL2006PTC155447 SATYA ENTERTAINMENT NETWORKS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/10/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
RAJESH KUMAR SHARMA Director NAWAL KISHORE AGARWAL Director GEETA AGARWAL Director